EP0323609 - Method for preparing light-coloured indene-coumarone resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Oil Co., Ltd. 1-3-12, Nishishimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO., LTD. 1-3-12, Nishishimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hisatake 1-22-12, Nakatehara Kohhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Makino, Masaharu 4-4-6, Higashiterao Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/28] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121403.5 | 21.12.1988 | [1989/28] | Priority number, date | JP19870332279 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33227987 | [1989/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323609 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323609 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F244/00 | [1989/28] | CPC: |
C08F244/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines wenig gefärbten Inden-Cumaron-Harzes | [1989/28] | English: | Method for preparing light-coloured indene-coumarone resin | [1989/28] | French: | Méthode de préparation d'une résine indène-coumarone peu colorée | [1989/28] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/20] | 23.12.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB946379 (NEVILLE CHEMICAL CO) | [A] - CHEMISCHES ZENTRALBLATT, Nr. 16, 1962, page 5864; W.W. SSALNIKOW: "Die Gewinnung von Cumaronharzen durch katalytische und thermische Polymerisation" |