EP0322801 - Preparation of fine-cell rigid polyurethane foam using amine catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | ||
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560 Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Mie-ken / JP | ||
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Oaza-Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi 746 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamano, Yutaka 216-5, Ohaza-Shikuma Tokuyama-shi Yamaguchi / JP | 02 /
Arai, Shoji 2-15-4-201, Doi Shinnnanyo-shi Yamaguchi / JP | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88121603.0 | 23.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | JP19870327382 | 25.12.1987 Original published format: JP 32738287 | JP19880013520 | 26.01.1988 Original published format: JP 1352088 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322801 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322801 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322801 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/18, C08G18/20, C08G18/00, C08J9/02 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
B01J31/04 (KR);
C08G18/18 (KR);
C08G18/1875 (EP,US);
C08G18/20 (KR);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/27] | C08G18/18, C08G18/20, C08G18/14, C08J9/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/27] | Title | German: | Herstellung von feinzellularen harten Polyurethan-Schaumstoffen unter Verwendung eines Amin-Katalysators | [1989/27] | English: | Preparation of fine-cell rigid polyurethane foam using amine catalyst | [1989/27] | French: | Préparation de mousse de polyuréthane rigide à cellules fines en utilisant un catalyseur d'amine | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 14.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Request for further processing for: | 04.12.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.12.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.11.1994 | [1995/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4148980 (NARAYAN THIRUMURTI); | [A]EP0004309 (BAYER AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0137321 |