EP0322851 - Carburetor for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEBER S.r.l. Corso Marconi, 20 I-10125 Torino / IT | For all designated states Jorio, Paolo c/o Ingg. Carlo e Mario Torta Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | For all designated states Bongiovanni, Guido c/o Ingg. Carlo e Mario Torta Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | For all designated states Prato, Roberto c/o Ingg. Carlo e Mario Torta Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states WEBER S.r.l. Corso Marconi, 20 I-10125 Torino / IT | ||
For all designated states Jorio, Paolo c/o Ingg. Carlo e Mario Torta Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | |||
For all designated states Bongiovanni, Guido c/o Ingg. Carlo e Mario Torta Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | |||
For all designated states Prato, Roberto c/o Ingg. Carlo e Mario Torta Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veraldi, Arnaldo Via Carelli,10 I-40039 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | 02 /
Gamberini, Guiseppe Via Longhena, 9 I-40100 Bologna / IT | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Boggio, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 88121696.4 | 27.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | IT19870068128 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: IT 6812887 | [1989/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322851 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322851 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02M1/10 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
F02M1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Vergaser für Brennkraftmaschine | [1989/27] | English: | Carburetor for an internal combustion engine | [1989/27] | French: | Carburateur pour moteur à combustion interne | [1989/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 08.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/52] | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB571932 (BENDIX AVIAT CORP); | [A]US3837322 (SHISHIDO T, et al); | [A]FR2448040 (PIERBURG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |