EP0326709 - Steam turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1989/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertilsson, Jan-Erik Mittelgasse 4 CH-5301 Siggenthal-Station / CH | [1989/32] | Application number, filing date | 88121746.7 | 28.12.1988 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | CH19880000332 | 01.02.1988 Original published format: CH 33288 | [1989/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0326709 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326709 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/18, F01D1/02 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
F01D1/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/32] | Title | German: | Dampfturbine | [1989/32] | English: | Steam turbine | [1989/32] | French: | Turbine à vapeur | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU182737 ; | [X]DE663207 (OSKAR JEBENS); | [X]CH211167 (ESCHER WYSS MASCHF AG [CH]); | [X]GB530022 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) |