EP0275128 - Machine for continuous compacting and sintering of thermoplastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.1992 [1992/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRATELLI TENCHINI S.n.c. Strada dell'Orsina 4 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | [1988/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tenchini, Mario Viale Dante Alighieri, 131 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | 02 /
Tenchini, Rolando Via Castagna, 11 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | de Pasquale, Carlo Via Carlo Ravizza 53 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | de Pasquale, Carlo Via Carlo Ravizza 53 I-20149 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88200007.8 | 06.01.1988 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | IT19870019057 | 13.01.1987 Original published format: IT 1905787 | [1988/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0275128 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0275128 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29B13/02, B29B9/06, B29B17/00 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
B30B11/202 (EP);
B29B13/022 (EP);
B29B17/00 (EP);
B29B9/08 (EP);
B30B11/201 (EP);
B30B11/207 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Komprimieren und Sintern von thermoplastischen Materialien | [1988/29] | English: | Machine for continuous compacting and sintering of thermoplastic materials | [1988/29] | French: | Dispositif pour compacter et fritter en continu des matériaux thermoplastiques | [1988/29] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/45] | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1767381 ; | [A]DE1454887 (WITTROCK LUDWIG); | [A]DE1937547 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER); | [A]US3950120 (JONES HERBERT, et al); | [A]US4316713 (TRICKETT STANLEY) |