EP0282106 - System for synchronizing with a semi-numerical signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE GRAND PUBLIC 51, Rue Carnot 92150 Suresnes / FR | For:DE
ES
GB
IT
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For:FR
PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE GRAND PUBLIC 51, Rue Carnot F-92150 Suresnes / FR | ||
For:DE
ES
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1989/15] | For:FR
LA RADIOTECHNIQUE PORTENSEIGNE 51, Rue Carnot F-92150 Suresnes / FR | ||
For:DE
ES
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1989/12] | For:FR
LA RADIOTECHNIQUE PORTENSEIGNE 51, rue Carnot F-92150 Suresnes / FR | ||
For:DE
ES
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1988/37] | For:FR
LA RADIOTECHNIQUE PORTENSEIGNE 51, Rue Carnot F-92150 Suresnes / FR | ||
For:DE
ES
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rakhodai, Issa Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Couderc, Pascal Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 03 /
Lefebvre, Serge Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Caron, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Caron, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88200185.2 | 03.02.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | FR19870001471 | 06.02.1987 Original published format: FR 8701471 | [1988/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282106 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282106 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/13 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
H04N11/08 (EP,US);
H04N7/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | System zur Synchronisierung auf einem halbdigitalen Signal | [1988/37] | English: | System for synchronizing with a semi-numerical signal | [1988/37] | French: | Système de synchronisation sur un signal semi-numérique | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0167430 (FRANCE ETAT [FR], et al) |