EP0293018 - Aircraft modal suppression system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 M.S. 7E-25 Seattle Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chakravarty, Abhijit Jitendra Mohan 1327 South Puget Drive No. F-34 Renton, WA 98055 / US | 02 /
Cooper, Steven Roy 2642 N.W. 59th No. 201 Seattle, WA 98107 / US | 03 /
Ho, John Koon-Hung 12848 S.E. 161st Street Renton, WA 98058 / US | 04 /
Tran, Chuong Bot 2 West Casino RD. No. 215 Everett, WA 98204 / US | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 88200190.2 | 03.02.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | US19870055801 | 28.05.1987 Original published format: US 55801 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293018 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293018 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293018 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/08 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
G05D1/0825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/48] | Title | German: | System zur Modenunterdrückung für Flugzeuge | [1988/48] | English: | Aircraft modal suppression system | [1988/48] | French: | Système de suppression de modes pour avion | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 21.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1994
07.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE Daimler-Benz Aerospace Airbus GmbH Postfach 95 01 09 D-21111 Hamburg / DE | [1998/12] |
Former [1994/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.1994
07.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Aerospace Airbus GmbH Abt. GZ13 BRE D-28183 Bremen / DE | 05.07.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.11.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 31.03.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/10] | 31.03.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.09.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.09.1993 | NL | 01.09.1993 | [1999/42] |
Former [1994/25] | NL | 01.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2298132 (BOFORS AB [SE]); | [A]WO8702964 (GRUMMAN AEROSPACE CORP [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF GUIDANCE AND CONTROL. vol. 6, no. 4, 01 July 1983, NEW YORK US pages 251 - 257; J.H.Blakelock: "Design and Analysis of a Digitally Controlled Integrated Flight/Fire Control System." | [P] - 1987 AMERICAN CONTROL CONF. vol. 1, 10 June 1987, MINNEAPOLIS,MN pages 395 - 396; T.J.Goslin;F.H.Ansari;: "An optmized yaw damper for enhanced passenger ride comfort" |