EP0283088 - Device for forming a stack of a zigzag folded web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.08.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1990 | Refusal of application | published on 10.10.1990 [1990/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kleverlaan-Snoek, Hendrika Merlijnstraat 20 NL-1813 EL Alkmaar / NL | [1988/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleverlaan, Franciscus Gerardus Martinus Merlijnstraat 20 NL-1813 EL Alkmaar / NL | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Baarslag, Aldert D., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Baarslag, Aldert D., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 88200455.9 | 08.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | NL19870000599 | 12.03.1987 Original published format: NL 8700599 | [1988/38] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0283088 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0283088 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/101 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
B65H45/1015 (EP);
B65H2405/1111 (EP);
B65H2701/11231 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Stapeln einer vorgefalteten Bahn | [1988/38] | English: | Device for forming a stack of a zigzag folded web | [1988/38] | French: | Dispositif pour former une pile d'une bande pliée en accordéon | [1988/38] | File destroyed: | 01.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/19] | 28.03.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/41] | 20.05.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.04.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL7704318 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]US3944208 (NAEGELI LLOYD); | [Y]GB1288218 ; | [Y]FR2560862 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [A]US4358285 (FUJINO HITOSHI) |