EP0304966 - Beta-ketonitriles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumimoto, Shinzaburo No. 35-18, Iwazono-cho Ashiya-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishizuki, Ichiro No. 5-8, Tokiwadai 4-chome Toyono-cho Toyono-gun Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Kai, Hiroyuki No. 2496, Oaza-Aburahi Koka-cho Koka-gun Shiga-ken / JP | 04 /
Ueda, Shiro No. 23-3-404, Takadomo 3-chome Asahi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Takase, Akira No. 15-6, Kitagoya 4-chome Kita-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/09] | Bizley, Richard Edward BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88200680.2 | 23.10.1986 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | JP19850238344 | 23.10.1985 Original published format: JP 23834485 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0304966 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0304966 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C121/34, C07D261/14, A01N43/80, A61K31/42 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
C07D271/06 (EP,US);
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07D261/14 (EP,US);
C07D271/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1989/09] | Title | German: | Beta-Ketonitrile | [1989/09] | English: | Beta-ketonitriles | [1989/09] | French: | Bêta-cétonitriles | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 30.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86308261.6 / EP0220947 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0220025 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]); | [A]FR2390425 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) | by applicant | US4268679 | US4507145 | US4336264 | EP0044185 | EP0049071 | EP0220947 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 70, no. 21, page 96286S | - W.R. NES; A. BARGER, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1950), vol. 72, page 5409 |