EP0290070 - Roll-type cover for a dry shaver and method of making it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gosch, Peter c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Klemen, Albert c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Wolfger, Arno c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Gorter, Willem Karel, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Gorter, Willem Karel, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88200754.5 | 20.04.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | AT19870001025 | 24.04.1987 Original published format: AT 102587 | [1988/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290070 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290070 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/38 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
B26B19/12 (KR);
B26B19/38 (EP,US);
B26B19/382 (EP,US);
B26B19/3853 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Rolladen für einen Trockenrasierapparat und Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Rolladens | [1988/45] | English: | Roll-type cover for a dry shaver and method of making it | [1988/45] | French: | Volet roulant pour rasoir à sec et procédé de production de ce volet roulant | [1991/27] |
Former [1988/45] | Roulant pour rasoir à sec et procédé de production de roulant | Examination procedure | 26.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 23.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.07.1991 | NL | 03.07.1991 | [1992/32] |
Former [1992/09] | NL | 03.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1122410 [ ]; | GB876245 [ ] (WALTER ROWLAND HART); | US3143796 [ ] (BEVERLY BOND); | EP0078934 [ ] |