EP0293956 - Method and device for treating knitting yarns along the knitwear edge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 72760 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 D-72760 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goller, Ernst Hindenburgstrasse 37 D-7410 Reutlingen 1 / DE | 02 /
Haltenhof, Hans Günther Wackersteinstrasse 42/4 D-7417 Pfullingen / DE | 03 /
Glauner, Bertram Moltkestrasse 85 D-7410 Reutlingen 1 / DE | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Dreiss, Hosenthien, Fuhlendorf & Partner Gerokstrasse 6 D-70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88200833.7 | 22.04.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | DE19873715297 | 08.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3715297 | [1988/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293956 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293956 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D04B7/26 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
D04B15/38 (EP);
D04B1/126 (EP);
D04B15/06 (EP);
D04B15/565 (EP);
D04B35/02 (EP);
D04B7/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/18] |
Former [1991/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, LI | ||
Former [1988/49] | ES | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Behandeln der Strickgarne längs des Gestrickrandes | [1988/49] | English: | Method and device for treating knitting yarns along the knitwear edge | [1988/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour traiter les fils de tricotage au bord du tricot | [1988/49] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/18: Verbunden mit 88903248.8/0358653 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 14.03.91 | EPB 1991/18: Consolidated with 88903248.8/0358653 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 14.03.91 | EPB 1991/18: Jointe à la demande no. 88903248.8/0358653 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 14.03.91 | Examination procedure | 01.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.12.1991 | NL | 11.12.1991 | SE | 11.12.1991 | AT | 22.04.1992 | LU | 30.04.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1994/25] | BE | 11.12.1991 | |
NL | 11.12.1991 | ||
SE | 11.12.1991 | ||
AT | 22.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 11.12.1991 | |
NL | 11.12.1991 | ||
SE | 11.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | NL | 11.12.1991 | |
SE | 11.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/28] | SE | 11.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE723362 (SEYFERT & DONNER); | [A]US2560484 (PETER SCHOENSTER, et al); | [A]DE1086388 (ARTHUR JOSEPH COBERT, et al); | [A]US3831403 (BRUELEMANS K); | [A]DE2415885 (STOLL & CO H); | [A]US4347718 (HAVERLAND WILLIAM H, et al) |