EP0293032 - Synthetic, crystalline, porous material containing oxides of silicon and boron [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1994 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 20121 Milano / IT | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 90139 Palermo / IT | For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 I-20121 Milan / IT | ||
For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 I-90139 Palermo / IT | |||
For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellussi, Giuseppe Via Alberto Scoto 44 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | 02 /
Perego, Giovanni Piazzale S. di Santarosa 4 I-20156 Milan / IT | 03 /
Clerici, Mario Gabriele Via Europa 34 I-20097 San Donato Milanese Milan / IT | 04 /
Giusti, Aldo Via di Meassino 10 I-55100 Lucca / IT | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1994/11] | De Carli, Erberto ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1988/48] | Roggero, Sergio Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88200950.9 | 11.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | IT19870020670 | 26.05.1987 Original published format: IT 2067087 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293032 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293032 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293032 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C01B35/10, C01B33/34, C01B33/20, B01J29/04, B01J20/10 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
C07C2/12 (EP);
B01J29/86 (EP);
C01B35/1009 (EP);
C07C2529/86 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/48] | C01B35/10, C01B33/28, C01B33/20, B01J29/04, B01J20/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Synthetisches, kristallines, poröses Material enthaltend Oxiden von Silicium und Bor | [1988/48] | English: | Synthetic, crystalline, porous material containing oxides of silicon and boron | [1988/48] | French: | Matériau synthétique cristallin et poreux contenant des oxydes de silicium et de bore | [1988/48] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0059059 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0100115 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]GB2144727 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC); | [A]FR2573326 (LAPORTE INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) |