EP0296648 - Liquid metering system with a broad range of volumes, viscosities and applications chiefly for oil-sector fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUMPTECH N.V. Atlantic House Noorderlaan 147 Bus 5C, 5th Floor 2030 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | For all designated states PUMPTECH N.V. Atlantic House Noorderlaan 147 Bus 5C, 5th Floor B-2030 Antwerpen / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lively, Kirk Hinnavagen 42 N-4030 Hinna / NO | 02 /
Montaron, Bernard 1, Allée du Parc F-42270 Saint Priest en Jarez / FR | 03 /
Pauzon, Jean-Jacques 4, Rue Honoré de Balzac F-42000 Saint Etienne / FR | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François Schlumberger Dowell Dowell Patent and Licensing Deptartment 26 Rue de la Cavée 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Richebourg, Michel François Schlumberger Dowell Dowell Patent and Licensing Deptartment 26 Rue de la Cavée 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1988/52] | Richebourg, Michel François Schlumberger Dowell Dowell Patent and Licensing Dept. 26, rue de la Cavée F-92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88200951.7 | 11.05.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | FR19870007723 | 02.06.1987 Original published format: FR 8707723 | [1988/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296648 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01F13/00, G01F15/00, B67D5/30 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
B67D7/303 (EP);
G01F13/00 (EP);
G01F15/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1988/52] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsdosiersystem mit einem weiten Volumen- und Viskositätsbereich und Anwendungen, insbesondere für Flüssigkeiten der Erdölindustrie | [1988/52] | English: | Liquid metering system with a broad range of volumes, viscosities and applications chiefly for oil-sector fluids | [1988/52] | French: | Système de dosage de liquide à grande dynamique de volumes et de viscosités et applications notamment aux liquides du secteur pétrolier | [1988/52] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 13.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/39] | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5882123 ; | [Y]US3651989 (WESTRICH MILTON D); | [Y]WO8604572 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 176 (P-214)[1321], 4th August 1983; & JP-A-58 82 123 (TOUKIYOU TATSUNO K.K.) 17-05-1983, & JP5882123 A 00000000 |