blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0294865

EP0294865 - ROM memory programming procedure using MOS technology with thin gate oxide and junctions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Srl
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1989/46]For all designated states
SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l.
Via C. Olivetti, 2
I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
Former [1988/50]For all designated states
SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.p.A.
Stradale Primosole 50
I-95121 Catania (CT) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Galbiati, Sergio
Via C. Terni 39
I-24047 Treviglio (Bergamo) / IT
02 / Comi, Alessandro
Via G. Rossini 6
I-20044 Bernareggio (Milano) / IT
[1988/50]
Representative(s)Mittler, Enrico, et al
Mittler & C. S.r.l.
Viale Lombardia, 20
20131 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1988/50]Mittler, Enrico, et al
c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20
I-20131 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date88201013.520.05.1988
[1988/50]
Priority number, dateIT1987002087211.06.1987         Original published format: IT 2087287
[1988/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0294865
Date:14.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0294865
Date:12.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1988
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/10, G11C17/00
[1988/50]
CPC:
G11C17/12 (EP,US); H10B20/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1988/50]
TitleGerman:Programmierverfahren für ROM-Speicher unter Verwendung der MOS-Technologie mit dünnen Gateoxid und mit Übergängen[1988/50]
English:ROM memory programming procedure using MOS technology with thin gate oxide and junctions[1988/50]
French:Procédé de programmation de mémoires ROM utilisant une technologie de type MOS à oxyde de grille mince et à jonctions[1988/50]
Examination procedure04.05.1989Examination requested  [1989/29]
06.09.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.11.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.1993Fee for grant paid
19.01.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.1994No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4356042  (GEDALY JERRELL M, et al);
 [A]US4385432  (KUO CHANG-KIANG, et al);
 [A]US4564854  (OGURA MITSUGI [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.