Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] |
09.08.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] |
06.06.1990 | First examination report | |
21.06.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] |
22.10.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.12.1988 [1988/49] |