EP0293054 - Novel diglycidyl ethers of diphenolic alkanes and their use in curable compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raudenbusch, Werner Theodor Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
* * * | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1988/48] | Aalbers, Onno P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201057.2 | 25.05.1988 | [1988/48] | Priority number, date | GB19870012454 | 27.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8712454 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0293054 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0293054 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D303/27, C08G59/24 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
C08G59/245 (EP);
C07D303/24 (EP);
C08G59/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Diglycidyl Äther von Diphenolalkanen und ihre Verwendung in härtbaren Zusammensetzungen | [1988/48] | English: | Novel diglycidyl ethers of diphenolic alkanes and their use in curable compositions | [1988/48] | French: | Diglycidyl éthers d'alcanes diphénoliques et leur utilisation dans des compositions durcissables | [1988/48] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/37] | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB726830 ; | [Y]EP0082572 ; | [Y]GB1068561 |