EP0299564 - Temper mill installation and shearing machine for use in such an installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1992 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1992 [1992/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOOGOVENS GROEP B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [1989/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Blok, Jan Francies Van Loenenlaan 53 NL-1945 TB Beverwijk / NL | 02 /
Korver, Johannes Cornelis Korteweide 79 NL-1722 VC Zuid-Scharwoude / NL | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus, et al HOOGOVENS GROEP BV P.O. Box 10.000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Van Breda, Jacobus, Mr. Ir., et al HOOGOVENS GROEP BV P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | ||
Former [1989/03] | Zuidema, Bert, Ir. p/a HOOGOVENS GROEP B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201386.5 | 04.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | NL19870001643 | 13.07.1987 Original published format: NL 8701643 | [1989/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299564 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299564 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23D25/00 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
B23D19/04 (EP);
B21B15/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE [1989/03] | Title | German: | Härtungswalzwerk mit Schneidvorrichtung | [1989/03] | English: | Temper mill installation and shearing machine for use in such an installation | [1989/03] | French: | Laminoir de trempe ayant un dispositif de coupe | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 26.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB868867 (WELLMAN SMITH OWEN ENG CO LTD); | [A]GB934951 (WILLIAM ROBERT WARDEN); | [A]US3740848 (LINDLEY J) |