EP0303311 - Method of manufacturing an electrically conductive contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.04.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klomp, Johannes Theodorus c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 Nl-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van de Ven, Adrianus Johannes Cornelis c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 Nl-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Pennings, Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | Pennings, Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201550.6 | 18.07.1988 | [1989/07] | Priority number, date | NL19870001789 | 29.07.1987 Original published format: NL 8701789 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0303311 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
C04B35/4508 (EP,KR);
H10N60/0744 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer elektrisch leitenden Verbindung | [1989/07] | English: | Method of manufacturing an electrically conductive contact | [1989/07] | French: | Procédé pour la réalisation d'une connection électroconductrice | [1989/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/25] | 30.01.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |