EP0304107 - Implant injection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frederick, Mervyn Joseph Witte Hoeflaan 20 NL-5343 EH Oss / NL | 02 /
Koenen, Wilhelm Engelinus Overlangelseweg 8 NL-5371 PN Ravenstein / NL | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Hermans, Frans G.M., et al Patent Department AKZO NOBEL N.V. Pharma Division P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | Hermans, Franciscus G.M., et al Patent Department AKZO NOBEL N.V. Pharma Division P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201594.4 | 22.07.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | NL19870001934 | 18.08.1987 Original published format: NL 8701934 | [1989/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304107 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304107 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
A61M37/0069 (EP,US);
A61M37/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/08] | Title | German: | Injektionsvorrichtung für ein Implantat | [1989/08] | English: | Implant injection device | [1989/08] | French: | Appareil pour injecter un implant | [1989/08] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 02.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8400304 (HARMAN MITCHELL); | [A]GB2138298 (HUNDON FORGE LTD) |