Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0310151 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0310151



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 135
26.04.1994 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
26.04.1994 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
21.04.1994 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
02.02.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.02.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.01.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.01.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
20.01.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
20.01.1994 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 3
20.01.1994 Means of redress Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.10.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.07.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.07.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.04.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
08.04.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.03.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.03.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
05.03.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.03.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.04.1992 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.02.1992 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.02.1992 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.02.1992 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.12.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
26.11.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.10.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.10.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
01.10.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
24.09.1991 Claims Search / examination 2
24.09.1991 Description Search / examination 3
24.09.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.09.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.06.1991 Claims Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.05.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.04.1989 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.02.1989 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
08.02.1989 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
02.02.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.02.1989 European search report Search / examination 2
26.07.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.07.1988 Claims Search / examination 2
26.07.1988 Description Search / examination 7
26.07.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.1988 Drawings Search / examination 3
26.07.1988 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
26.07.1988 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.07.1988 Priority document Search / examination 14
26.07.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5