Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0310151


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.04.2015 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
06.10.1994 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.11.1994 [1994/47]
21.04.1994 Revocation of patent published on  08.06.1994 [1994/23]
05.03.1993 Opposition filed published on  28.04.1993 [1993/17]
17.04.1992 (Expected) grant published on  03.06.1992 [1992/23]
07.05.1991 First examination report
07.06.1989 Request for examination filed published on  26.07.1989 [1989/30]
18.02.1989 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.1989 [1989/14]