Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0310151

Designated contracting states AT 
 CH 
 DE 
 ES 
FR 
 IT 
 LI 
Examination procedure07.12.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted03.06.1992
Opposition procedure30.01.1994Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 01.06.1994 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:24.07.1992 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:05.04.1989 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT CH DE ES FR IT LI
 
Event date:03.06.1992 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT CH DE ES FR IT LI
 
Event date:26.07.1989 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19890523
 
Event date:26.06.1991 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19910510
 
Event date:03.06.1992 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:76776
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19920615
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:09.07.1992 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3871692
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19920709
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:19.08.1992 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
 
Event date:16.12.1992 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2031581 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.05.1994 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:28.04.1993 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:NIRO A/S
Effective DATE:19930303
 
Event date:08.06.1994 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:19940130
 
Event date:07.06.1993 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:19930607
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:20.08.1993 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:19930820
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:12.08.1993 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:19930812
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:30.07.1993 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:19930730
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:11.06.1993 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:19930611
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:17.04.1992 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:18.02.1989 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:21.04.1994 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: PATENT REVOKED
 
Event date:21.04.1994 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271
 
Event date:05.03.1993 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260