blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0310151

EP0310151 - Apparatus for the precipitation of gaseous pollutants from exhaust gases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1989/14]Method and apparatus for the precipitation of gaseous pollutants from exhaust gases
[1992/23]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.04.1994
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG
Postfach 10 15 01
60015 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/14]For all designated states
METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG
Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14
D-60015 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jury, Egon
W.-Borchert-Strasse 16
D-6073 Egelsbach / DE
[1989/14]
Application number, filing date88201612.426.07.1988
[1989/14]
Priority number, dateDE1987373235325.09.1987         Original published format: DE 3732353
[1989/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0310151
Date:05.04.1989
Language:DE
[1989/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0310151
Date:03.06.1992
Language:DE
[1992/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.1989
ClassificationIPC:B01D53/34, B05B3/10
[1989/14]
CPC:
B05B3/1057 (EP,US); B01D53/504 (EP,US); B01D53/68 (EP,US);
B05B3/1021 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI [1989/14]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Abscheidung gasförmiger Schadstoffe aus Abgasen[1992/23]
English:Apparatus for the precipitation of gaseous pollutants from exhaust gases[1992/23]
French:Dispositif pour la précipitation de polluants gazeux d'un gaz d'échappement[1992/23]
Former [1989/14]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abscheidung gasförmiger Schadstoffe aus Abgasen
Former [1989/14]Method and apparatus for the precipitation of gaseous pollutants from exhaust gases
Former [1989/14]Méthode et dispositif pour la précipitation de polluants gazeux d'un gaz d'échappement
Examination procedure23.05.1989Examination requested  [1989/30]
10.05.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.09.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.12.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.1991Fee for grant paid
07.12.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.03.1993  17.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Niro A/S
Gladsaxevej 305
DK-2860 Soborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Simonsen, Christian Rosendal
Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Rigensgade 11
1316 Copenhagen K / DK
 [N/P]
Former [1993/17]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.1993  17.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Niro A/S
Gladsaxevej 305
DK-2860 Soborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Simonsen, Christian Rosendal
c/o Internationalt Patent-Bureau Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23
DK-2630 Taastrup / DK
08.04.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.01.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.01.1994Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1994/47]CH03.06.1992
LI03.06.1992
Documents cited:Search[A]US4246242  (BUTLER CHARLES H S, et al);
 [A]DE3135721  (RANSBURG GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP0109224  (RANSBURG JAPAN LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0142377  (DRESSER IND [US]);
 [A]WO8701963  (PERFLUKTIV TECHNIK AG [CH])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.