EP0304111 - Method of carrying out exothermic processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beisswenger, Hans Freiligrathstrasse 2 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Wechsler, Alexander Teodor 4455 Douglas Avenue 4 C Riverdale New York 10471 / US | [1989/08] | Application number, filing date | 88201643.9 | 30.07.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | US19870080424 | 31.07.1987 Original published format: US 80424 | [1989/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304111 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304111 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F23C11/02, B01J8/38 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
F23C10/10 (EP,US);
F23C10/005 (EP,US);
F23C2206/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Durchführung exothermer Prozesse | [1989/08] | English: | Method of carrying out exothermic processes | [1989/08] | French: | Méthode de mise en oeuvre de processus exothermiques | [1989/08] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 25.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2328507 (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | [A]EP0082673 (YORK SHIPLEY INC [US]); | [A]US4424766 (BOYLE BEDE A [AU]); | [A]US4434726 (JONES BRIAN C [US]); | [A]US4709662 (RAWDON ALBERT H [US]) |