EP0304981 - Automobile seal and trimming gasket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA LANCIA S.p.A. Viale Alfa Romeo 20020 Arese (Milan) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | For all designated states ALFA LANCIA S.p.A. Viale Alfa Romeo I-20020 Arese, Milan / IT | ||
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states ALFA LANCIA INDUSTRIALE S.p.A. Viale Alfa Romeo I-20020 Arese Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villa, Ezio Via Martiri della Libertà 2 I-20020 Arese Milan / IT | 02 /
Biazzi, Giuseppe Via Ugo Foscolo 15 I-21040 Uboldo Varese / IT | 03 /
Guelfi, Giorgio Via Medardo Rosso 16 I-20159 Milan / IT | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88201653.8 | 01.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | IT19870021666 | 14.08.1987 Original published format: IT 2166687 | [1989/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304981 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304981 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/06, E06B7/23, B60R13/07 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
B60J10/24 (EP,US);
E06B7/2312 (US);
B60J10/25 (EP,US);
B60J10/30 (EP,US);
B60J10/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugdichtungsprofil | [1989/09] | English: | Automobile seal and trimming gasket | [1989/09] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité pour véhicule automobile | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 03.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5730640 ; | [A]DE634860 (RUDOLF J SCHEU); | [X]DE760116 (MAIER FRIEDRICH DIPL-ING); | [A]GB1577312 (BLOXVICH LOCK STAMPING); | [Y]EP0022130 (SEMPERIT AG [AT]); | [X]GB2060039 (SCHLEGEL UK LTD); | [YD]GB2104008 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]); | [A]EP0163991 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]); | [Y]FR2580999 (RENAULT [FR]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 93 (M-133)[971], 29th May 1982, page 158 M 133; & JP-A-57 30 640 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) 18-02-1982, & JP5730640 A 00000000 |