Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |
24.03.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] |
14.05.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] |
01.09.1992 | Change - representative | published on 21.10.1992 [1992/43] |
17.03.1992 | First examination report | |
24.07.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] |
07.01.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.02.1989 [1989/08] |