Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0304132 | Global Dossier | 30.06.1993 | B1 | EP0304132 | 22.02.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8816687 | 21.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1329452 | 17.05.1994 | C | Priority number | Date | US8816687 | 21.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3882103T | 02.12.1993 | T2 | DE3882103D1 | 05.08.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US8816687 | 21.08.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4798860 | 17.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US8816687 | 21.08.1987 |