EP0309016 - Process for making briquettes without binders, from steel plant dusts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szekely, Ladislaus Hauptstrasse 76 D-6366 Wölfersheim / DE | 02 /
Stieler, Fred Breslauer Strasse 22 D-5056 Heusenstamm / DE | [1989/13] | Application number, filing date | 88201775.9 | 18.08.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | DE19873732351 | 25.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732351 | [1989/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309016 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309016 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/24, C22B7/02 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
C22B7/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22B1/24 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von bindemittellosen Briketts aus Stahlwerksstäuben | [1989/13] | English: | Process for making briquettes without binders, from steel plant dusts | [1989/13] | French: | Procédé de fabrication à partir de poussières d'aciéries, de briquettes sans liant | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/43] | 30.08.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 17.04.1991 | [2006/32] |
Former [1992/20] | FR | 06.09.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1006195 (HAUTS FOURNEAUX SA); | [X]FR2313450 (MIDREX CORP [US]); | [AD]EP0097292 (THYSSEN AG [DE]); | [A]DE3529084 (THYSSEN STAHL AG) | Examination | DE2625223 |