EP0307041 - Sterically hindered amino compounds and processes for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 20121 Milano / IT | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 90139 Palermo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 I-20121 Milan / IT | ||
For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 I-90139 Palermo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roggero, Arnaldo Via Libertà 72 I-20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | 02 /
Bertolini, Guglielmo Via Parco Vecchio 30/3 I-27100 Pavia / IT | [1993/50] |
Former [1989/11] | 01 /
Roggero, Arnaldo Via Liberta 72 I-20097 San Donato Milanese Milan / IT | ||
02 /
Bertolini, Guglielmo Via Parco Vecchio 30/3 I-27100 Pavia / IT | Representative(s) | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1994/20] | De Carli, Erberto ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1989/11] | Roggero, Sergio Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88201890.6 | 05.09.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | IT19870021890 | 11.09.1987 Original published format: IT 2189087 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0307041 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0307041 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307041 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/46, C08K5/34 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
C08K5/3435 (EP);
C07D211/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | Sterisch gehinderte Aminoverbindungen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1989/11] | English: | Sterically hindered amino compounds and processes for their preparation | [1989/11] | French: | Composés aminés à encombrement stérique et leurs procédés de préparation | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3640928 (MURAYAMA KEISUKE, et al); | [A]DE2258752 (CIBA GEIGY AG) |