EP0309041 - Capped electric lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanders, Rudolf c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van Heeswijk, Johannes Antonius Adrianus Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Marie, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1989/13] | Van Schaik, Johannes Wilhelmus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88202008.4 | 15.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | NL19870002273 | 24.09.1987 Original published format: NL 8702273 | NL19880001326 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: NL 8801326 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309041 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309041 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/56, H01K1/46 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
H01J5/56 (EP,US);
H01K1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1989/13] | Title | German: | Gesockelte elektrische Lampe | [1989/13] | English: | Capped electric lamp | [1989/13] | French: | Lampe électrique à culot | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0193997 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]US4594529 (DE VRIJER BERTUS [NL]); | [AD]EP0231935 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]); | [A]US3219870 (KLAUS GOTTSCHALK) |