EP0310162 - Information recording and/or read system and recording and/or read apparatus for use such a system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/14] | Information recording and/or read system, and record carrier and recording and/or read apparatus for use such a system | ||
[1992/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optical Storage International Holland Emmasingel 6 5611 AZ Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states Optical Storage International Holland Emmasingel 6 NL-5611 AZ Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verboom, Johannes Jacobus c/o Emmasingel 6 NL-5611 AZ Eindhoven / NL | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Peters, Rudolf Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Peters, Rudolf Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88202010.0 | 15.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | NL19870002261 | 23.09.1987 Original published format: NL 8702261 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310162 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310162 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/095, G11B27/30, G11B7/013 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
G11B7/24085 (EP,US);
G11B7/085 (KR);
G11B27/19 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B7/0953 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/14] | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungs- und/oder -wiedergabesystem und Aufzeichnungs- und/oder Wiedergabegerät zur Anwendung eines derartigen Systems | [1992/30] | English: | Information recording and/or read system and recording and/or read apparatus for use such a system | [1992/30] | French: | Système d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction et appareil d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction pour utiliser un tel système | [1992/30] |
Former [1989/14] | Informationsaufzeichnungs- und/oder -wiedergabesystem und Aufzeichnungsträger und Aufzeichnungs- und/oder Wiedergabegerät zur Anwendung eines derartigen Systems | ||
Former [1989/14] | Information recording and/or read system, and record carrier and recording and/or read apparatus for use such a system | ||
Former [1989/14] | Système d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction et porteur d'enregistrement et appareil d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction pour utiliser un tel système | Examination procedure | 27.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 28.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 22.07.1992 | [1993/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58169354 ; | [A]JP6159633 ; | [A]US3881184 (KOEPCKE RICHARD WAYNE, et al); | [A]EP0019503 (THOMSON BRANDT [FR]); | [AD]US4365324 (MICHAELIS THEODORE D); | [AD]EP0096969 (BURROUGHS CORP [US]); | [A]GB2158611 (RCA CORP); | [A]EP0210623 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0225259 (THOMSON ALCATEL GIGADISC [FR]); | [XP]US4764914 (ESTES MARVIN F [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 10 (P-248)[1447], 18th January 1984; & JP-A-58 169 354 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 05-10-1983, & JP58169354 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 255 (P-484)[2281], 6th August 1986; & JP-A- 61 59 633 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD) 27-03-1986, & JP6159633 A 00000000 | Examination | WO8902644 |