EP0311167 - Tailored triglycerides having improved autoignition characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, David K. 9990 Arborwood Dr. No. 401 Cincinnati Ohio 45239 / US | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [1989/15] | Ernst, Hubert PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 88202066.2 | 22.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | US19870102071 | 29.09.1987 Original published format: US 102071 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311167 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311167 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311167 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C11C3/00, A23D7/00, A23D9/00 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
C11C3/02 (EP,US);
A23D7/001 (EP,US);
A23D7/003 (EP,US);
A23D9/00 (EP,US);
Y10S426/804 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/02] | C11C3/00, A23D5/00 | ||
Former IPC [1989/15] | C11C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/15] | Title | German: | Synthetische Triglyceride mit verbesserten Selbstentzündungseigenschaften | [1989/15] | English: | Tailored triglycerides having improved autoignition characteristics | [1989/15] | French: | Triglycérides synthétiques à caractères d'inflammation spontanée | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4607052 (MENDY FRANCOIS [FR], et al); | [A]EP0196210 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [AD]EP0216419 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |