EP0311171 - Device for coupling components which can move relative to each other, and a transport mechanism which uses this device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Picanol N.V. Polenlaan 3-7 8900 Ieper / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states Picanol N.V. Polenlaan 3-7 B-8900 Ieper / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shaw, Henry Zuiddreef 5 B-8982 Vleteren / BE | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 88202078.7 | 23.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | BE19870001154 | 09.10.1987 Original published format: BE 8701154 | [1989/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0311171 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311171 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D03J1/00, B25J15/04 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
B25J15/04 (EP);
B25J17/0208 (EP);
D03J1/00 (EP);
H01R13/631 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1989/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verbinden von gegeneinander beweglichen Elementen und damit ausgerüsteter Transportmechanismus | [1989/15] | English: | Device for coupling components which can move relative to each other, and a transport mechanism which uses this device | [1989/15] | French: | Dispositif pour accoupler des éléments qui peuvent se mouvoir relativement l'un par rapport à l'autre et mécanisme de transport utilisant ce dispositif | [1989/15] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 30.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 10.07.1991 | IT | 10.07.1991 | LI | 10.07.1991 | FR | 29.11.1991 | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/25] | CH | 10.07.1991 | |
LI | 10.07.1991 | ||
FR | 29.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/07] | CH | 10.07.1991 | |
LI | 10.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8629693U ; | [A]EP0120275 |