EP0322046 - An agricultural machine for distributing material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [1997/33] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Berg, Karel 31 Meulenbroek Bleskensgraaf / NL | 02 /
Ouwerkerk, Cornelis Gerardus 19 Eikenlaan Rozenburg / NL | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 88202906.9 | 16.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | NL19870003087 | 21.12.1987 Original published format: NL 8703087 | NL19880001834 | 20.07.1988 Original published format: NL 8801834 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322046 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322046 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A01C15/04, A01C7/10, A01M7/00, B65G53/66 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
B65G53/66 (EP);
A01C7/084 (EP);
A01C7/105 (EP);
A01M7/0089 (EP);
A01C15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Maschine, um ein Produkt zu streuen | [1989/26] | English: | An agricultural machine for distributing material | [1989/26] | French: | Machine agricole pour distribuer un produit | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 20.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.1995
02.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 51 49202 Hasbergen-Gaste / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.1995
02.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 51 49202 Hasbergen-Gaste / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al, et al Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | 20.02.1995 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 28.02.1995 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 09.03.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.07.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.10.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/02] | Appeal following opposition | 08.01.1996 | Appeal received No. T0030/96 | 18.03.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.10.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 01.10.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.05.1994 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3912121 (STEFFEN RONALD W); | [A]US3936904 (BASHARK LARRY THOMAS); | [A]WO8301850 (MEZOEGAZ TERMELOESZOEVET [HU]); | [X]EP0158985 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) | Examination | EP0308154 |