EP0322076 - Print head platen gap adjustment mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1991 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adamek, Manfred Fliederweg 36 D-5242 Kirchen-Freusburg / DE | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Erdmann, Anton, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Erdmann, Anton, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88202964.8 | 19.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | DE19873743677 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3743677 | [1989/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322076 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322076 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/30 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
B41J25/308 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einstellen des Abstandes zwischen einem Druckwiderlager und einem Druckkopf | [1989/26] | English: | Print head platen gap adjustment mechanism | [1989/26] | French: | Mécanisme pour régler l'espacement entre la tête d'impression et le cylindre de frappe | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 25.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 03.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/01] | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6244480 ; | [A]FR2294854 ; | [A]DE3112079 ; | [A]EP0194844 ; | [A]US4444521 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 234 (M-611)[2681], 30. Juli 1987; & JP-A-62 44 480 (NEC CORP.) 26-02-1987, & JP6244480 A 00000000 |