EP0322077 - Optical backscattering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brinkmeyer, Ernst, Prof. Dr. Mittelstrasse 33 D-2110 Buchholz / DE | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Koch, Ingo, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Wendenstrasse 35c D-20097 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Koch, Ingo, Dr.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Wendenstrasse 35c D-20097 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88202965.5 | 19.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | DE19873743678 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3743678 | [1989/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322077 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322077 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/00 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
G01M11/3172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/26] | Title | German: | Optisches Rückstreumessgerät | [1989/26] | English: | Optical backscattering device | [1989/26] | French: | Dispositif de rétrodiffusion optique | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/36] | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.02.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3008187 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD); | [Y]DE3236300 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [Y] - INSTRUMENTS AND EXPERIMENTAL TECHNIQUES | [Y] - NACHRICHTEN TECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT N.T.Z. | [Y] - WIRLESS WORLD |