EP0322984 - Coating type, chromate conversion coating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Ohyodo-Kita 2-chome Ohyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Ohyodo-Kita 2-chome Ohyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sobata, Tamotsu 2-21-108, Takeshirodai 1-chome Sakai-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Ushio, Akira 45-5, Higashifunabashi 2-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 88203022.4 | 27.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | JP19870332694 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33269487 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322984 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322984 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/28, C09D5/08 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
C09D5/08 (EP);
C23C22/28 (EP);
C23C22/74 (EP);
C23C28/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/27] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung für Chromatumwandlungsüberzüge | [1989/27] | English: | Coating type, chromate conversion coating composition | [1989/27] | French: | Composition de revêtement de conversion au chromate | [1989/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/53] | 25.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4170671 (HIRASAWA YOUJI [JP], et al); | [X]FR2527624 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [X]FR2544733 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) |