EP0278585 - Packaged solid state surge protector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th floor Montreal Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED 600 de la Gauchetiere Street West Montreal Quebec H3B 4N7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borkowicz, Jerzy 2721 Skuce Street Ottawa Ontario Canada K2B 8K9 / CA | 02 /
Trumble, William Patrick 18 McClure Crescent Kanata Ontario Canada K2L 8K9 / CA | 03 /
Anderson, James Edward R.R. No. 3 Almonte Ontario Canada K0A 1AO / CA | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Laurence, Simon French, et al Northern Telecom Europe Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow Essex CM20 2SH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Laurence, Simon French, et al Northern Telecom Europe Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2SH / GB | ||
Former [1988/33] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300011.9 | 04.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | CA19870528200 | 26.01.1987 Original published format: CA 528200 | US19870101094 | 25.09.1987 Original published format: US 101094 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278585 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278585 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/62, H02H9/04, H01L23/04 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
H02H9/044 (EP);
H01L23/051 (EP);
H01L23/62 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP);
H01L2224/2612 (EP);
H01L2924/10157 (EP);
H01L2924/10158 (EP);
H01L2924/12035 (EP);
H01L2924/1301 (EP);
H01L2924/3011 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12035, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/1301, H01L2924/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [1988/33] | H01L23/04, H02H9/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Gekapselte Halbleiter-Stossspannungsschutzeinrichtung | [1988/33] | English: | Packaged solid state surge protector | [1988/33] | French: | Protection de sur tension encapsulée à semi-conducteur | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.09.1993 | NL | 15.09.1993 | SE | 15.09.1993 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 15.09.1993 | |
NL | 15.09.1993 | ||
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 15.09.1993 | |
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 15.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2598031 (ALSTHOM [FR]); | [Y]EP0123126 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [A]GB2057762 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]DE3113850 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3238557 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]US3928093 (VAN TONGERLOO ERIC HENRY, et al) |