EP0324210 - Separation of citric acid from fermentation broth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP (a New York general partnership) 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [1990/21] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states UOP INC. 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | ||
Former [1989/29] | For all designated states UOP INC. 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kulprathipanja, Santi 3920 Winston Drive Hoffman Estates Illinois 60172 / US | [1989/29] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | Brock, Peter William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300155.4 | 11.01.1988 | [1989/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324210 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324210 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/265, C07C51/47 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
C07C51/47 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/47, C07C59/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/29] | Title | German: | Abtrennung von Zitronensäure aus Fermentationsbrühen | [1989/29] | English: | Separation of citric acid from fermentation broth | [1989/29] | French: | Séparation d'acide citrique à partir de bouillons de fermentation | [1989/29] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 20.09.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.12.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2985589 (BROUGHTON DONALD B, et al); | [X]GB868926 (BENCKISER GMBH JOH A); | [A]CH523861 (SUN OIL CO [US]); | [YD]US3706812 (ROSSET ARMAND J DE, et al); | [A]DE2931759 (BENCKISER GMBH JOH A); | [A]US4353839 (CLEARY MICHAEL T, et al) |