EP0276141 - Apparatus for mounting chip device on printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IKEGAMI TSUSHINKI CO., LTD. 6-16, Ikegami 5-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states IKEGAMI TSUSHINKI CO., LTD. 6-16, Ikegami 5-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koibuchi, Masaaki c/o Mito Factory Ikegami Tsushinki Co., Ltd. 1230, Ohaza-Mukaiyama Naka-Machi Naka-Gun Ibaraki Pref. / GB | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1988/30] | Application number, filing date | 88300457.4 | 20.01.1988 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | JP19870010225 | 20.01.1987 Original published format: JP 1022587 | JP19870141914 | 06.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14191487 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276141 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276141 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/04, H05K13/02 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
H05K13/0417 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1702 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1744 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1768 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53191 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Montieren von Chipbauelementen auf eine gedruckte Leiterplatte | [1988/30] | English: | Apparatus for mounting chip device on printed circuit board | [1988/30] | French: | Appareil de montage de dispositifs à puces sur une carte à circuits imprimés | [1988/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/36] | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4312109 (KAWANA TAKESHI, et al); | [A]US4177549 (MAYAHARA KIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US3889801 (BOYER HAROLD E) |