EP0277765 - Method for the removal of nitrogen oxides from the exhaust gas of a diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/32] | Method for tag removal of nitrogen oxides from the exhaust gas of a diesel engine | ||
[1992/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1992/15] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Kagaku Kogyo Co., Ltd 1, 5-chome, Koraibashi Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Motonobu c-2, 931-11 Hamada Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Kinoshita, Futoru 931-11 Hamada Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Mitsui, Kiichiro 2-6-11, Ohji Akashi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Akira 59-1, Ikaganishimachi Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300705.6 | 27.01.1988 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | JP19870015290 | 27.01.1987 Original published format: JP 1529087 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277765 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277765 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, F01N3/28, F01N3/20 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
B01D53/9431 (EP,US);
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F02D41/1462 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/146 (EP,US);
F01N2900/08 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung von Stickstoffoxiden aus einem Dieselmotorabgas | [1988/32] | English: | Method for the removal of nitrogen oxides from the exhaust gas of a diesel engine | [1992/12] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation des oxydes d'azote de gaz d'échappement d'un moteur diesel | [1988/32] |
Former [1988/32] | Method for tag removal of nitrogen oxides from the exhaust gas of a diesel engine | Examination procedure | 16.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4403473 (GLADDEN JOHN R [US]); | [A]FR2254367 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4188364 (GLADDEN JOHN R [US]); | [A]DE2249411 (DEUTSCHE VERGASER GMBH CO KG) |