Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] |
30.11.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] |
25.06.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.08.1988 [1988/32] |