Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0277782 | Global Dossier | 17.01.1990 | A3 | EP0277782 | 10.08.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US1083087 | 04.02.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63202599 | 22.08.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US1083087 | 04.02.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4782920 | 08.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US1083087 | 04.02.1987 |