EP0277044 - Cross flow fan system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Syozo 1-302 Nara-haitsu, 136-3, Sanjo-cho Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Takushima, Akira 24-506, 3-1, Kataokadai, Kanmaki-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Akira B-303, 1-2, Kabutodai, Kizo-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Shinobu, Yoshiharu 785, Toichi-cho Kashihara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300834.4 | 01.02.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | JP19870020890 | 30.01.1987 Original published format: JP 2089087 | JP19870055067 | 10.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5506787 | JP19870054693 | 10.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5469387 | JP19870160608 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: JP 16060887 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0277044 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0277044 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277044 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04D17/04 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
F04D17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/31] | Title | German: | Querstromgebläse | [1988/31] | English: | Cross flow fan system | [1988/31] | French: | Ventilateur à courant transversal | [1988/31] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU901642 [ ]; | [A]US1920952 (ANDERSON EDWARD L); | [A]US3124301 ; | [X]GB988712 (GOTTFRIED DAETWYLER); | [A]US3258195 (NIKOLAUS LAING); | [X]FR1446638 (KARL HEINKEL APPBAU K G); | [X]GB1066053 (HOOVER LTD); | [X]US3322332 (NIKOLAUS LAING); | [X]GB1136981 (FIRTH CLEVELAND LTD); | [A]US3459365 (GLUCKSMAN DOV ZEEV, et al); | [X]EP0056843 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [ ] - Soviet Inventions Illustrated, Derwent Publications Ltd., Section Mechanical, Week J 50, Abstract B 1237 J/50, Q56, February 2, 1983; & SU-A-901642 (KOROVKIN) 30-01-1982, Abstract., & SU901642 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0056483 |