EP0278659 - OCS enhancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGRIGENETICS LP 5649 E. Buckeye Road Madison Wisconsin 53716 / US | For all designated states THE COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states AGRIGENETICS LP 5649 E. Buckeye Road Madison Wisconsin 53716 / US | ||
For all designated states THE COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | |||
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states AGRIGENETICS LP 5649 E. Buckeye Road Madison Wisconsin 53716 / US | ||
For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | |||
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states LUBRIZOL ENTERPRISES, INC. 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe Ohio 44092 / US | ||
For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | |||
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states LUBRIZOL ENTERPRISES, INC. 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe Ohio 44092 / US | ||
For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Division of Radiophysics, 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellis, Jeff G. 19 Roberts Street Macquarie A.C.T. / AU | 02 /
Llewellyn, Daniel J. 6 Myall Street O'Connor A.C.T. 2601 / AU | 03 /
Peacock, W. James 16 Brassey Street Deakin A.C.T. 2600 / AU | 04 /
Dennis, Elizabeth 100 Hopetown Court Yarrahwanda A.C.T. / AU | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300853.4 | 02.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | US19870011614 | 06.02.1987 Original published format: US 11614 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278659 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278659 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278659 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/05 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/67 (EP,US);
C12N15/8216 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/33] | C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | OCS-Enhancer | [1988/33] | English: | OCS enhancer | [1988/33] | French: | Enhancer-OCS | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.1995 | GR | 24.05.1995 | SE | 24.08.1995 | [2000/04] |
Former [1996/04] | AT | 24.05.1995 | |
SE | 24.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 24.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - THE EMBO JOURNAL, vol. 6, no. 1, January 1987, pages 11-16, IRL Press Ltd, Eynsham, Oxford, GB; J.G. ELLIS et al.: "Maize Adh-1 promoter sequences control anaerobic regulation: addition of upstream promoter elements from constitutive genes is necessary for expression in tobacco" | [XP] - THE EMBO JOURNAL, vol. 6, no. 11, November 1987, pages 3203-3208, IRL Press Ltd, Oxford, GB; J.G. ELLIS et al.: "The OCS element: a 16 base pair palindrome essential for activity of the octopine synthase enhancer" | [XPO] - UCLA SYMP. MOL. CELL. BIOL., NEW SER., vol. 62 (Plant gene systems and their biology), Proceedings of a CIBA-GEIGY-UCLA Symposium, Tamarron, Colorado, 2nd - 8th February 1987, pages 263-277, Alan R. Liss, Inc., New York, US; J. PEACOCK et al.: "Developmental and environmental regulation of the maize alcohol deydrogenase 1 (Adhl) gene: Promoter-enhancer interactions" | [A] - MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 7, no. 1, January 1987, pages 59-67, American Society for Microbiology; W.B. BRUCE et al.: "Functional domains of a T-DNA promoter active in crown gall tumors" | [Y] - NATURE, vol. 318, no. 6046, 12th December 1985, pages 579-582, London, GB; M.P. TIMKO et al.: "Light regulation of plant gene expression by an upstream enhancer-like element" | Examination | - essential for activity of the octopine synthase enhancer" |