EP0281255 - Container for a number of packaged contact lenses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1993 [1993/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PRODUCTS, INC. 1417 San Marco Boulevard P.O.Box 10157 Jacksonville, Florida 32207 / US | [1991/26] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states VISTAKON, INC. 1325 San Marco Boulevard P.O.Box 10157 Jacksonville Florida 32247 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashley, Charles R. Off Main Street Pattenburg NJ 08809 / US | 02 /
Crossman, Russell J. 4496 Charter Point Blvd. Jacksonville FL. 32211 / US | 03 /
Hennessy, John P. 4451 Charter Point Blvd. Jacksonville FL. 32211 / US | 04 /
Lahm, William J. 8849 Sanduski Ave. South Jacksonville FL. 32216 / US | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300977.1 | 05.02.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | US19870011820 | 06.02.1987 Original published format: US 11820 | [1988/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0281255 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0281255 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/26, // G02C13/00 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
A61L2/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61L12/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/36] | Title | German: | Behälter für verpackte Kontaktlinsen | [1988/36] | English: | Container for a number of packaged contact lenses | [1988/36] | French: | Récipient pour des lentilles de contact emballées | [1988/36] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 14.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3737067 (PALSON R); | [A]US3961893 (RUSSELL JAMES S, et al); | [A]US4040518 (CARTER JESSE DONALD); | [A]GB2090141 (SYNTHES AG) |