EP0278720 - Aromatic polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICTREX MANUFACTURING LIMITED York House Hillhouse International PO Box 4 Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states VICTREX MANUFACTURING LIMITED York House Hillhouse International PO Box 4 Thornton Cleveleys Lancashire FY5 4QD / GB | ||
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newton, Alan Branford Heatherview Moor Garth Lealholmside Lealholm North Yorkshire / GB | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Brierley, Anthony Paul, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Brierley, Anthony Paul, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [1993/21] | Graham, John George Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1993/14] | Arnold, Graham Donald ICI Group Intellectual Property P.O.Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1989/44] | Graham, John George Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1988/33] | Browne, Robin Forsythe Legal Department Patents Imperial Chemical Industries PLC PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301049.8 | 09.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | GB19870002993 | 10.02.1987 Original published format: GB 8702993 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278720 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278720 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278720 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/40, C08G75/20 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
C08G65/4012 (EP,US);
C08G75/20 (EP,US);
C08G75/23 (EP,US);
C08L2205/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Aromatisches Polymer | [1988/33] | English: | Aromatic polymer | [1988/33] | French: | Polymère aromatique | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.1995 | BE | 18.01.1995 | CH | 18.01.1995 | ES | 18.01.1995 | LI | 18.01.1995 | NL | 18.01.1995 | LU | 28.02.1995 | SE | 18.04.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 18.01.1995 | |
BE | 18.01.1995 | ||
CH | 18.01.1995 | ||
LI | 18.01.1995 | ||
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1995 | ||
SE | 18.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 18.01.1995 | |
BE | 18.01.1995 | ||
CH | 18.01.1995 | ||
LI | 18.01.1995 | ||
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
SE | 18.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 18.01.1995 | |
BE | 18.01.1995 | ||
CH | 18.01.1995 | ||
LI | 18.01.1995 | ||
NL | 18.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 18.01.1995 | |
BE | 18.01.1995 | ||
CH | 18.01.1995 | ||
LI | 18.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 18.01.1995 | |
CH | 18.01.1995 | ||
LI | 18.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/32] | CH | 18.01.1995 | |
LI | 18.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2378812 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [X]EP0030033 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0113112 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0194062 (ICI PLC [GB]) |