Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] |
29.11.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] |
17.11.1990 | First examination report | |
30.03.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] |
06.08.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.09.1988 [1988/38] |