EP0280582 - Improvements in computer graphics systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIOM INNOVATION LIMITED 1 Logan Mews London W8 6QP / GB | [1994/43] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states CAPLIN CYBERNETICS CORPORATION LTD. Poplar Business Park Unit C26, 10 Prestons Road London E14 9RL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips, David John 284 Old Farm Avenue Sidcup Kent DA15 8AR / GB | [1988/35] | Representative(s) | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301742.8 | 29.02.1988 | [1988/35] | Priority number, date | GB19870004653 | 27.02.1987 Original published format: GB 8704653 | GB19870027119 | 19.11.1987 Original published format: GB 8727119 | GB19880001012 | 18.01.1988 Original published format: GB 8801012 | [1988/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280582 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280582 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0280582 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/00 | [1988/35] | CPC: |
G09G5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/29] |
Former [1988/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Graphische Computersysteme | [1988/35] | English: | Improvements in computer graphics systems | [1988/35] | French: | Systèmes graphiques à ordinateur | [1988/35] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.01.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   07.03.1991 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.1991 | 28.02.1994 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1994 | 28.02.1995 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   04.04.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.1995 | BE | 19.07.1995 | CH | 19.07.1995 | ES | 19.07.1995 | FR | 19.07.1995 | GR | 19.07.1995 | IT | 19.07.1995 | LI | 19.07.1995 | NL | 19.07.1995 | SE | 19.10.1995 | DE | 20.10.1995 | LU | 29.02.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 19.07.1995 | |
BE | 19.07.1995 | ||
CH | 19.07.1995 | ||
ES | 19.07.1995 | ||
GR | 19.07.1995 | ||
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
LI | 19.07.1995 | ||
NL | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 19.07.1995 | |
BE | 19.07.1995 | ||
CH | 19.07.1995 | ||
ES | 19.07.1995 | ||
GR | 19.07.1995 | ||
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
LI | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 19.07.1995 | |
BE | 19.07.1995 | ||
CH | 19.07.1995 | ||
GR | 19.07.1995 | ||
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
LI | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.07.1995 | |
BE | 19.07.1995 | ||
CH | 19.07.1995 | ||
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
LI | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 19.07.1995 | |
BE | 19.07.1995 | ||
CH | 19.07.1995 | ||
LI | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/19] | AT | 19.07.1995 | |
CH | 19.07.1995 | ||
LI | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/18] | AT | 19.07.1995 | |
CH | 19.07.1995 | ||
LI | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 19.07.1995 | |
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 19.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0121015 (IBM [US]); | [X]WO8502049 (BURROUGHS CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0147542 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0153197 (IBM [US]) |