EP0282235 - Power transmission belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD. No. 1-21, 4-Chome, Hamazoe-dori Nagata-ku Kobe City Hyogo, pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD. No. 1-21, 4-Chome, Hamazoe-dori Nagata-ku Kobe City Hyogo, pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshiro, Takesi No. 24-3, Komyo-sho Takarazuka Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Matsuo, Mu No. 1060-9, Shimotokari Nagaizumi-sho Sunto-gun Sizuoka / JP | 03 /
Takano, Hiroshi No. 2-543, Higasi-Jiyugaoka Shijimi-cho Miki Hyogo / JP | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88301878.0 | 03.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | JP19870050961 | 04.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5096187 | JP19870149781 | 15.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14978187 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282235 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282235 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/18 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
F16G5/18 (EP,KR,US);
F16G7/00 (KR);
Y10T403/32631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | Treibriemen | [1988/37] | English: | Power transmission belt | [1988/37] | French: | Courroie de transmission de puissance | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 26.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2242963 (WENDLING ALFRED J); | [X]US2690678 (BENDALL WILFRID H); | [X]US4430067 (WHITAKER RANALD O [US]) |